Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0813533

EP0813533 - SUBSTITUTED N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b QUINOLIN-4 AMINES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/52]SUBSTITUTED N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b]QUINOLIN-4 AMINES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF
[2007/46]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.02.2000
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2007Change - English titlepublished on 14.11.2007  [2007/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016 / US
[1999/21]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
SANOFI WINTHROP, INC.
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Virendra
14 Lynne Circle
Paoli, PA 19301 / US
02 / DORITY, John, A., Jr.
P.O. Box 44
West Haven, CT 06516 / US
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Le Guen, Gérard , et al
CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
[1997/52]
Application number, filing date96910367.005.03.1996
[1997/52]
WO1996US02972
Priority number, dateUS1995040226910.03.1995         Original published format: US 402269
[1997/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9628446
Date:19.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0813533
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996
[1997/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.09.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/47
[1997/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/52]
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B CHINOLIN-4-AMINE UND IHRE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[1997/52]
English:SUBSTITUTED N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b QUINOLIN-4 AMINES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF[2007/46]
French:N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b QUINOLIN-4-AMINES A SUBSTITUTION ET LEURS COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION[2007/46]
Former [1997/52]SUBSTITUTED N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b]QUINOLIN-4 AMINES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF
Former [1997/52]N-CYCLOALKYLMETHYL-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-b]QUINOLIN-4-AMINES A SUBSTITUTION ET LEURS COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase04.09.1997National basic fee paid 
04.09.1997Search fee paid 
04.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/52]
25.01.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4013665  (CRENSHAW RONNIE RAY, et al) [AD] 1-14 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]FR2149275  (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *;
 [A]US3600393  (GRAEVE ROLF ERNST, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
International search[A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 106, issued 1987, RADL et al., "Preparation of Some 1-Substituted 4-Alkylamino-3-Methyl-1H-Pyrazolo[3,4-b]Qui nolines with Potential Antiviral Effect", page 595, Abstract No. 18429p; & CESK. FARM., 35(3), (1986), pages 105-109.,
 [A]  - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 19, No. 2, issued 1976, R.R. CRENSHAW et al., "Interferon Inducing Activities of Derivatives of 1,3-Dimethyl-4-(3-Dimethylaminopropylamino) -1H-Pyrazolo[3,4-b]Quinoline and Related Compounds", pages 262-275.,