Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777813

EP0777813 - FORMATION ISOLATION AND TESTING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED
3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200
Houston TX 77027 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED
3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200
Houston Texas 77027 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BERGER, Per, Erik
Hegreberg
N-4082 Vestre Amoy / NO
02 / REIMERS, Nils
Kannikgata 26A
N-4005 Stavanger / NO
03 / MACUNE, Don, Thornton
1835 Norfolk
Houston, TX 77098 / US
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Finck, Dieter , et al
V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano
Patentanwälte
Mariahilfplatz 2-3
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date96910656.628.03.1996
[1997/24]
WO1996US04345
Priority number, dateUS1995041455831.03.1995         Original published format: US 414558
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9630628
Date:03.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0777813
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777813
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.10.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/10, E21B33/124
[2000/51]
Former International [1997/24]E21B49/10, E21B49/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/24]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ISOLIEREN UND TESTEN EINER FORMATION[1997/24]
English:FORMATION ISOLATION AND TESTING APPARATUS AND METHOD[1997/24]
French:ISOLATION DE FORMATIONS, APPAREIL DE TEST ET PROCEDE S'Y RAPPORTANT[1997/24]
Entry into regional phase31.12.1996National basic fee paid 
31.12.1996Search fee paid 
31.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
05.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2003Fee for grant paid
07.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US4635717  (JAGELER ALFRED H [US]) [X] 1,2,6,17-23,25-27 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, lines 36-40 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5233866  (DESBRANDES ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,5,6,18,20,21,28 * column 5, lines 53-62 * * column 6, lines 38-45 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 7 * * figure 9 *
International search[X]US4635717  (JAGELER ALFRED H [US]);
 [X]US4573532  (BLAKE WILLIAM R [US]);
 [X]US4860580  (DUROCHER DAVID [US])
 [X]  - SPE 26496, A.R. SMITS et al., "In Situ Optical Fluid Analysis as an Aid to Wireline Formation Sampling", Presented at 68TH ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION OF THE SOCIETY OF PETROLEUM ENGINEERS, Houston, Texas, 03-06 October 1993, pages 1-11.,