Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0819358

EP0819358 - VIDEO MONITORING AND CONFERENCING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2009
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.02.2009  [2009/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Multi-Format, Inc.
100 Industrial Avenue
Little Ferry NJ 07643 / US
[2008/04]
Former [1998/04]For all designated states
WASHINO, Kinya
80 Hamilton Avenue
Dumont, NJ 07624 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WASHINO, Kinya
80 Hamilton Avenue
Dumont, NJ 07624 / US
02 / SCHWAB, Barry, H.
5298 Cedarhurst
West Bloomfield, MI 48322 / US
[1998/04]
Representative(s)Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/04]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date96910747.304.04.1996
[1998/04]
WO1996US04652
Priority number, dateUS1995041882307.04.1995         Original published format: US 418823
[1998/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9631984
Date:10.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0819358
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996
[1998/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0819358
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Search report(s)International search reportUS10.10.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/14, H04N5/232, G08B13/196, H04N7/15
[2000/04]
Former International [1998/04]H04N7/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1998/04]
TitleGerman:VIDEO-ÜBERWACHUNGS-UND KONFERENZSYSTEM[1998/04]
English:VIDEO MONITORING AND CONFERENCING SYSTEM[1998/04]
French:SYSTEME DE CONTROLE ET DE CONFERENCE VIDEO[1998/04]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1997National basic fee paid 
16.09.1997Search fee paid 
16.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/04]
10.02.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2007
24.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
11.01.2008Fee for grant paid
11.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06]
Request for further processing for:03.05.2006Request for further processing filed
03.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
12.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9203010  (DOCU VISION INC [US]) [X] 1,7,10,14 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 6 * * page 12, line 27 - line 32 * * page 18, line 9 - page 22, line 6; figures 1-5 * * page 34, line 26 - page 36, line 20; figure 9 * [Y] 1;
 [YX]US5258837  (GORMLEY AUSTIN [IE]) [Y] 1,7 * the whole document * [X] 10-12,14;
 [A]US4630110  (COTTON ROGER E [US], et al) [A] 1,7,10,14 * column 5, line 1 - line 23 * * column 7, line 7 - column 10, line 14; figures 1-3B *;
 [A]GB2226732  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,7,10,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5216502  (KATZ BARRY [US]) [A] 1,7,8,10,14 * column 3, line 5 - line 39; figure 3 *;
 [A]JPH04269086
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930205), vol. 017, no. 061, Database accession no. (E - 1316), [A] 1,2,10,11,13,14 * abstract *
International search[XP]US5481297  (CASH GLENN L [US], et al);
 [YE]US5526133  (PAFF ROBERT [US]);
 [Y]US5027222  (SHINBO MASATOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5272527  (WATANABE TSUYOSHI [JP]);
 [AP]US5491511  (ODLE JAMES A [US]);
 [AE]US5521634  (MCGARY DOUG [US])