EP0781437 - PARKING PAYMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mint AB Linnégatan 87 D 115 23 Stockholm / SE | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Payway Oy Elimäenkatu 5 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Sonera Oyj Teollisuuskatu 15 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Sonera Oy Sturenkatu 16 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states TELECOM FINLAND OY Sturenkatu 16, P.O. Box 106 00051 Tele / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHTI, Heikki Asematie 12 B 15 FIN-02700 Kauniainen / FI | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Rein Lahtela Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1997/27] | Lahti, Heikki Telecom Finland, Legal Affairs, P.O. Box 106 00051 Tele, Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96910990.9 | 24.04.1996 | [1997/27] | WO1996FI00223 | Priority number, date | FI19950000211U | 27.04.1995 Original published format: FI 950211 U | [1997/27] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634366 | Date: | 31.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781437 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781437 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0781437 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07C1/30, H04Q7/22, // G07F17/24 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
G07B15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR BEZAHLTES PARKEN | [1997/27] | English: | PARKING PAYMENT SYSTEM | [1997/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE PAIEMENT DE STATIONNEMENT | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1996 | Translation filed | 05.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
25.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE Peek Traffic AB PO Box 10158 12128 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Estreen, Lars J.F. Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | 02
10.09.2002
14.03.2005
WITHDRAWN Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB Box 23 101 10435 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Hansson, Sven Arnold Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
25.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE Peek Traffic AB PO Box 10158 12128 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Estreen, Lars Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
10.09.2002
14.03.2005
WITHDRAWN Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB Box 23 101 10435 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Hansson, Sven A. Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2002/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2002
25.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE Peek Traffic AB PO Box 10158 12128 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Estreen, Lars Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
02
10.09.2002
WITHDRAWN Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB Box 23 101 10435 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Hansson, Sven A. Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | 22.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.04.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.04.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.11.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.05.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.04.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 | 01.04.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.04.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | BE | 12.12.2001 | CH | 12.12.2001 | FI | 12.12.2001 | FR | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | IT | 12.12.2001 | LI | 12.12.2001 | NL | 12.12.2001 | DK | 12.03.2002 | PT | 12.03.2002 | DE | 13.03.2002 | GB | 24.04.2002 | IE | 24.04.2002 | LU | 24.04.2002 | MC | 24.04.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
FR | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
LU | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
LU | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
FR | 18.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
FR | 18.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
FR | 18.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
FR | 18.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
DE | 13.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
MC | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
GB | 24.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 12.12.2001 | |
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 12.12.2001 | |
FI | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 12.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8401073 (KATZEFF KURT, et al); | [X]WO9320539 (JONSSON TOMMY [SE]); | [A]WO9411849 (VATANEN HARRI TAPANI [FI]); | [XP]WO9611453 (PARKIT OY [FI], et al) | Examination | US5339000 | WO9627170 |