Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0850122

EP0850122 - PROTECTIVE LINING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ARCUATE CONTAINER WALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reynolds, Steve
2406 Citation Avenue
Owensboro, KY 42301 / US
[1998/27]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/27]
Representative(s)van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard
Octrooibureau Assenpatent B.V.
P.O. Box 1029
2240 BA Wassenaar / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/27]Van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard
Octrooibureau Assenpatent B.V. P.O. Box 1029
2240 BA Wassenaar / NL
Application number, filing date96911082.421.02.1996
[1998/27]
WO1996IB00437
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9730818
Date:28.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0850122
Date:01.07.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997
[1998/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23K37/04
[1998/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/27]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON BOGENFöRMIGEN WäNDEN EINES BEHäLTERS[1998/27]
English:PROTECTIVE LINING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ARCUATE CONTAINER WALLS[1998/27]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CHEMISAGE PROTECTEUR, DESTINES A DES PAROIS ARQUEES DE CONTENANT[1998/27]
Entry into regional phase10.11.1997National basic fee paid 
10.11.1997Search fee paid 
10.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
03.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/11]
11.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/11]
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.04.1998M01   Fee paid on   27.04.1998
Additional fee for renewal fee
24.11.199803   M01   Fee paid on   26.11.1998
29.02.200005   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2000
28.02.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2061369  (JAMES PRENDERGAST, et al);
 [X]US3458182  (FLACHBARTH CHARLES T, et al);
 [X]US5316277  (BANKS WILLIE E [US]);
 [Y]US5265317  (ANGEL JEFFREY R [US]);
 [Y]US2178817  (SMALL FREDERICK M);
 [Y]GB877792  (CIE FRANCAISE D ENTPR S, et al);
 [Y]SU640836  (STOLBOV YURIJ IVANOVICH [SU])