Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0886839

EP0886839 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMERCIAL PAYMENTS USING TRUSTED AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CITIBANK, N.A.
399 Park Avenue New York
New York 10043 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
CITIBANK, N.A.
399 Park Avenue
New York, New York 10043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSEN, Sholom, S.
Apartment 7A, 10 West 86th Street
New York, NY 10024 / US
[1999/01]
Representative(s)Robson, Aidan John , et al
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Robson, Aidan John , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Former [1999/01]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date96911357.022.03.1996
[1999/01]
WO1996US03824
Priority number, dateUS1995052126230.08.1995         Original published format: US 521262
[1999/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9708665
Date:06.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0886839
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0886839
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/08, G06F17/60
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR TREUHANDVERMITTLER GEBRAUCHENDE GESCHÄFLICHE ZAHLUNGEN[1999/01]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMERCIAL PAYMENTS USING TRUSTED AGENTS[1999/01]
French:SYSTEME ET METHODE DE PAIEMENTS COMMERCIAUX FAISANT APPEL A DES "AGENTS DE CONFIANCE"[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase16.02.1998National basic fee paid 
16.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/53]
01.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.1999Fee for grant paid
16.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99202502.3  / EP0952562
Opposition(s)19.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR19.01.2001
FI22.03.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2002/15]FI22.03.2001
Cited inInternational search[DYA]WO9310503  (CITIBANK NA [US]) [DY] 1,5,8,12 * abstract * [A] 13,14;
 [YA]EP0172670  (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]) [Y] 1,5,8,12 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,6,7,9,11,13,15,16;
 [A]WO9308545  (JONHIG LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,5-9,12,13,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0421808  (MANSVELT ANDRE PETER [ZA], et al);
 [A]US4926325  (BENTON WILLIAM M [US], et al)