EP0819120 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF FARNESYL PROTEIN TRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLL, Ronald, J. 126 Union Avenue Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | 02 /
MALLAMS, Alan, K. 147 Kings Highway Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US | 03 /
AFONSO, Adriano 10 Woodmere Road West Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US | 04 /
RANE, Dinanath, F. 2 Hayground Court Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | 05 /
ROSSMAN, Randall, R. 82 Oakley Terrace Nutley, NJ 07110 / US | 06 /
NJOROGE, F., George 2597 Juliat Place Union, NJ 07083 / US | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96911442.0 | 03.04.1996 | [1998/04] | WO1996US04171 | Priority number, date | US19950418973 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: US 418973 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9631477 | Date: | 10.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819120 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819120 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/16, A61K31/55, A61K31/435, A61K31/495, C07D401/14, C07D491/04, C07D211/32, C07D401/12, C07D409/12 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D211/32 (EP,US);
C07D221/16 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/04] | Extension states | LT | 06.10.1997 | LV | 06.10.1997 | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN VON FARNESYL PROTEIN TRANSFERASE | [2002/28] | English: | TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR INHIBITION OF FARNESYL PROTEIN TRANSFERASE | [1998/04] | French: | COMPOSES TRICYCLIQUES UTILES A L'INHIBITION DE LA TRANSFERASE DE PROTEINE FARNESYLE | [1998/04] |
Former [1998/04] | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN VERWENDBAR ZUR INHIBITION VON FARNESYL PROTEIN TRANSFERASE | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | BE | 04.06.2003 | CH | 04.06.2003 | FI | 04.06.2003 | LI | 04.06.2003 | NL | 04.06.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9500497 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9510514 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [PY] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9510515 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [PY] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DPY]WO9510516 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [DPY] 1-20* the whole document * |