blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0829477

EP0829477 - NOVEL PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE NA23063 ANALOGUES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.1998
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.1998Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.02.1999 [1999/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIKIORI, Takaaki
1039, Kamiochiai
Yono-shi, Saitama 338 / JP
02 / TSUCHIYA, Kouichi
1090, Kamiochiai
Yono-shi, Saitama 338 / JP
03 / KOBAYASHI, Shinichi
5-23-17, Nakatsuma
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362 / JP
04 / HARADA, Takashi
3-15-11, Haneda
Outa-ku, Tokyo 144 / JP
05 / ISHIDA, Kouichi
4808-3, Tenmacho
Mitsukaido-shi, Ibaraki 303 / JP
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96912266.226.04.1996
[1998/12]
WO1996JP01163
Priority number, dateJP1995013470509.05.1995         Original published format: JP 13470595
[1998/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9635683
Date:14.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0829477
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.11.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07D311/36, C12P17/16, A61K31/35
[1998/12]
CPC:
C07D311/36 (EP); C12N1/205 (EP); C12P17/06 (EP);
C12R2001/465 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/12]
TitleGerman:PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVE NA23063 ANALOGA, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[1998/12]
English:NOVEL PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE NA23063 ANALOGUES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND USE OF THE SAME[1998/12]
French:NOUVEAUX ANALOGUES DE NA23063 PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION[1998/12]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase06.11.1997Translation filed 
06.11.1997National basic fee paid 
06.11.1997Search fee paid 
06.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
06.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
01.12.1998Application withdrawn by applicant  [1999/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]  - T.HAKAMATSUKA, "ISOFLAVONE DIMERS FROM YEAST EXTRACT-TREATED CELL SUSPENSION CULTURES OF PUERARIA LOBATA.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1992), vol. 117, no. 11, Database accession no. 44577g, page 529, column 1, XP002061438 [DA] 1-3 * abstract *
    [ ] - Z.NATURFORSCH.,C:BIOSCI., DE, (1992), vol. 47, no. 3-4, pages 177 - 182
International search[A]JPH0686682  (KOBE STEEL LTD);
 [A]JPS50160483
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.