EP0823846 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [1999/37] |
Former [1998/08] | For all designated states SCA Mölnlycke AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNFORS, Ingemar Alfhöjdsgatan 13 S-431 38 Mölndal / SE | [1998/08] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/08] | Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96912366.0 | 18.04.1996 | [1998/08] | WO1996SE00501 | Priority number, date | SE19950001619 | 03.05.1995 Original published format: SE 9501619 | [1998/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9634588 | Date: | 07.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823846 | Date: | 18.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823846 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1998/08] | CPC: |
A61F13/49019 (EP,US);
A61F13/49017 (EP,US);
A61F13/491 (EP,US);
A61F13/496 (EP,US);
A61F13/5148 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49028 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49038 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49039 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/08] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL | [1998/08] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [1998/08] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [1998/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0437771 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2276529 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) |