Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0830456

EP0830456 - ISOLATED FrpB NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE AND VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL ; Office of Research Services
Campus Box No. 4100, 300 Bynum Hall
Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US
[2006/25]
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL ; Office of Research Services
Campus Box No. 4100, 300 Bynum Hall
Chapel Hill, NC 27599-4100 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SPARLING, P., Fredrick
Route 1, Box 980
Moncure, NC 27559 / US
02 / BEUCHER, Margaret
Apt. 5C, Greenwood Heights
Connellsville, PA 15425 / US
[1999/25]
Former [1998/13]01 / SPARLING, P., Fredrick
Route 1, Box 980
Moncure, NC 27559 / US
02 / BEUCHER, Margaret
Apartment 5C Greenwood Heights
Connellsville, PA 15425 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96912605.108.04.1996
[1998/13]
WO1996US04774
Priority number, dateUS1995041896407.04.1995         Original published format: US 418964
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9631618
Date:10.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0830456
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1996
[1998/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0830456
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)International search reportUS10.10.1996
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/04, C12P21/08, A61K35/18, A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C07K14/195, C07K16/12, C07H21/04, A61K39/095, C07K14/22
[2001/09]
Former International [1998/13]C12P21/04, C12P21/08, A61K35/18, A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C07K14/195, C07K16/12, C07H21/04, A61K39/095
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/13]
TitleGerman:ISOLIERTES FrpB NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜL UND ENTSPRECHENDE IMPFSTOFF[1998/13]
English:ISOLATED FrpB NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULE AND VACCINE[1998/13]
French:MOLECULE ISOLEE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE DE PROTEINE B REGULEE PAR Fe (FrpB) ET VACCIN UTILISANT CETTE MOLECULE[1998/13]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1997National basic fee paid 
06.11.1997Search fee paid 
06.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/13]
26.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2006Fee for grant paid
09.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Request for further processing for:12.10.2005Request for further processing filed
12.10.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2005Decision despatched
21.07.2004Request for further processing filed
21.07.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.08.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FR21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DE22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/22]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DE22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/06]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DE22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
Former [2007/21]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
ES02.10.2006
Former [2007/16]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
ES02.10.2006
Former [2007/03]AT21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
Former [2007/01]AT21.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ALA'ALDEEN DLAWER A ET AL, "Vaccine potential of meningococcal FrpB: Studies on surface exposure and functional attributes of common epitopes.", VACCINE 1994, (1994), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 535 - 541, XP002156437 [X] 1,5,8-14,16-22,24-28,30-32,35,36,41-44 * abstract * * page 535, column R - page 537, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90314-X
 [X]  - ALA'ALDEEN D A ET AL, "THE 70-KILODALTON IRON REGULATED PROTEIN OF NEISSERIA-MENINGITIDIS IS NOT THE HUMAN TRANSFERRIN RECEPTOR", FEMS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN MICROBIOLOGICAL SOCIETIES) MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS 1990, (1990), vol. 69, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 37 - 42, XP000916027 [X] 1,5,8-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(90)90409-J
 [PX]  - BEUCHER MARGARET ET AL, "Cloning, sequencing, and characterization of the gene encoding FrpB, a major iron-regulated, outer membrane protein of Neisseria gonorrhoeae.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY 1995, (19950407), vol. 177, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2041 - 2049, XP000916619 [PX] 1-44 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - "Neisseria gonorrhoeae iron-regulated outer membrane protein preFrpB (frpB) gene, complete cds.", DATABASE EMBL, (19950530), [PX] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - ALA'ALDEEN DLAWER A ET AL, "Vaccine potential of meningococcal FrpB: Studies on surface exposure and functional attributes of common epitopes.", Vaccine, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940101), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0264-410X(94)90314-X, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 535 - 541, XP002156437

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90314-X
 [XP]  - BEUCHER M, ET AL., "CLONING, SEQUENCING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF THE GENE ENCODING FRPB,A MAJOR IRON-REGULATED OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN OF NEISSERIA GONORRHOEAE", Pennsylvania University, (19950801), XP002941998
 [X]  - DYER D W, ET AL., "A PLEIOTROPIC IRON-UPTAKE MUTANT OF NEISSERIA MENINGITIDIS LACKS A 70-KILODALTON IRON-REGULATED PROTEIN", Infection and Immunity, American Society for Microbiology., US, US, (19880401), vol. 56, no. 04, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 977 - 983, XP002941951
 [XP]  - PETTERSSON A, ET AL., "MOLECULAR CHARACTERIZATION OF FRPB, THE 70-KILODALTON REGULATED OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN OF NEISSERIA MENINGITTIDIS", Infection and Immunity, American Society for Microbiology., US, US, (19951001), vol. 63, no. 10, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 4181 - 4184, XP002941952
Examination   - BJUNE ET AL: The Lancet 338(8775):1093-1096, 02.11.1991,