Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0767932

EP0767932 - LOW-VOLATILITY, SUBSTITUTED 2-PHENYL-4,6-BIS (HALOMETHYL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PGI Graphics Imaging LLC
103 Fourth Avenue
Waltham, Mass. 02154 / US
[2000/06]
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
Law & Patent Division 784 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
Former [1997/16]For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
549 Technology Square
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FITZGERALD, Maurice, J.
4 Tippy Cart Road
Canton, MA 02021 / US
02 / GUARRERA, Donna J.
11 Stirling Dr
Wilbraham, MA01095-1941 / US
03 / HARDIN, John, M.
17 Grovenor Road 5
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US
04 / KEARNEY, Frederick, R.
198 Bullard Road
Walpole, MA 02082 / US
05 / LIANG, Rong-Chang
185 Hobart Road
Newton, MA 02159 / US
06 / SCHWARZEL, William, C.
2 Montclair Circle
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
07 / WARNER, John, C.
47 Cedar Street
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
[1997/18]
Former [1997/16]01 / FITZGERALD, Maurice, J.
4 Tippy Cart Road
Canton, MA 02021 / US
02 / GUARRERA, Donna, J.
33 North Avenue
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
03 / HARDIN, John, M.
17 Grovenor Road 5
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US
04 / KEARNEY, Frederick, R.
198 Bullard Road
Walpole, MA 02082 / US
05 / LIANG, Rong-Chang
185 Hobart Road
Newton, MA 02159 / US
06 / SCHWARZEL, William, C.
2 Montclair Circle
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
07 / WARNER, John, C.
47 Cedar Street
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
Representative(s)Reitzner, Bruno , et al
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/16]Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date96912968.319.04.1996
[1997/16]
WO1996US05517
Priority number, dateUS1995043046128.04.1995         Original published format: US 430461
[1997/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9634315
Date:31.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0767932
Date:16.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.1996
[1997/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0767932
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/029
[1997/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/16]
TitleGerman:SCHWER-FLÜCHTIGE SUBSTITUIERTE 2-PHENYL-4,6-BIS(HALOMETHYL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE FÜR LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTEN[1999/22]
English:LOW-VOLATILITY, SUBSTITUTED 2-PHENYL-4,6-BIS (HALOMETHYL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATES[1997/16]
French:2-PHENYL-4, 6-BIS (HALOMETHYL)-1, 3, 5-TRIAZINE SUBSTITUE, A VOLATILITE REDUITE, POUR PLAQUES LITHOGRAPHIQUES[1999/22]
Former [1997/16]LEICHT FLÜCHTIGE SUBSTITUIERTE 2-PHENYL-4,6-BIS(HALOMETHYL)-1,3,5-TRIAZINE FÜR LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTEN
Former [1997/16]2-PHENYL-4, 6-BIS (HALOMETHYL)-1, 3, 5-TRIAZINE SUBSTITUE, A VOLATILITE ELEVEE, POUR PLAQUES LITHOGRAPHIQUES
Entry into regional phase11.12.1996National basic fee paid 
11.12.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/16]
16.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0332042  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * page 11; example 10 * * page 15; example 32 * * page 38 - page 42; claim 10 *;
 [AD]DE3726001  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-11 * page 8, line 15 - line 25 *;
 [A]GB2029428  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 27 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0503674  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 45 - line 46 * * page 21, line 15 - line 22 *