Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828704

EP0828704 - METHODS OF MAKING (S)-3-(AMINOMETHYL)-5-METHYLHEXANOIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road Morris Plains
New Jersey 07950 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
201 Tabor Road
Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUCKABEE, Brian, Keith
Apartment 3A 2975 Millpond Drive East
Holland, MI 49424 / US
02 / SOBIERAY, Denis, Martin
2178 South Bristol
Holland, MI 49424 / US
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Tesch, Rudolf , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Tesch, Rudolf, Dr. , et al
Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG, Mooswaldallee 1
79090 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date96913186.126.04.1996
[1998/12]
WO1996US05831
Priority number, dateUS1995045895002.06.1995         Original published format: US 458950
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9638405
Date:05.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828704
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828704
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C227/32, C07C229/08, C07C233/05
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/12]
Extension statesLT15.11.1997
LV15.11.1997
SI15.11.1997
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (S)-3-(AMINOETHYL)-5-METYLHEXANSÄURE[1998/12]
English:METHODS OF MAKING (S)-3-(AMINOMETHYL)-5-METHYLHEXANOIC ACID[1998/12]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE (S)-3-(AMINOMETHYL)-5-METHYLHEXANOIQUE[1998/12]
Entry into regional phase15.11.1997National basic fee paid 
15.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
16.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2001Fee for grant paid
21.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9323383  (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [A] 1 * example - *