Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0820424

EP0820424 - METHOD FOR THE CHEMICAL VAPOUR INFILTRATION OF A MATERIAL CONSISTING OF CARBON AND SILICON AND/OR BORON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA"
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
F-75015 Paris / FR
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION
24, rue Salomon de Rothschild
92150 Suresnes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ROBIN-BROSSE, Christian
52, avenue de la République
F-33185 Le Haillan / FR
02 / DELPERIER, Bernard
6, rue Louis-Pasteur
F-33127 Marignas-sur-Jalles / FR
03 / BONDIEU, Gilles
84, allée du Joli-Bois
F-33127 Saint-Jean-d'Illac / FR
[1998/05]
Representative(s)Joly, Jean-Jacques
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/05]Joly, Jean-Jacques
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date96913580.512.04.1996
[1998/05]
WO1996FR00561
Priority number, dateFR1995000438112.04.1995         Original published format: FR 9504381
[1998/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9632360
Date:17.10.1996
Language:FR
[1996/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0820424
Date:28.01.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996
[1998/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0820424
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/80, C04B35/577
[1998/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CHEMISCHEN DAMPFINFILTRATION EINES AUS KOHLENSTOFF UND SILICIUM UND/ODER BOR ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN MATERIALS[1998/05]
English:METHOD FOR THE CHEMICAL VAPOUR INFILTRATION OF A MATERIAL CONSISTING OF CARBON AND SILICON AND/OR BORON[1998/05]
French:PROCEDE POUR L'INFILTRATION CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR D'UN MATERIAU COMPOSE DE CARBONE ET DE SILICIUM ET/OU BORE[1998/05]
Entry into regional phase10.10.1997National basic fee paid 
10.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0483009  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * page 6, line 9 - line 27; figure 7; claim 1 *;
 [AD]WO8704733  (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [AD] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *