Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0774178

EP0774178 - DETECTION CIRCUIT WITH HYSTERESIS PROPORTIONAL TO THE PEAK INPUT VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/39]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/21]For all designated states
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FONDERIE, Maarten, J.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / HUIJSING, Johan, Hendrik
't Woudt 10
NL-2626 HD Schipluiden / NL
03 / TOY, Edmond
1430 Hawk Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
[1997/30]
Former [1997/21]01 / FONDERIE, Maarten, J.
1063 Morse Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
02 / HUIJSING, Johan, Hendrik
't Woudt 10
NL-2626 HD Schipluiden / NL
03 / TOY, Edmond
1430 Hawk Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
Representative(s)Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/21]Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date96913665.423.05.1996
[1997/21]
WO1996IB00486
Priority number, dateUS1995048854007.06.1995         Original published format: US 488540
[1997/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9641415
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0774178
Date:21.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0774178
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03K5/153
[1997/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/21]
TitleGerman:DETEKTORSCHALTUNG MIT ZUR EINGANGSSPITZENSPANNUNG PROPORTIONALER HYSTERESE[1997/21]
English:DETECTION CIRCUIT WITH HYSTERESIS PROPORTIONAL TO THE PEAK INPUT VOLTAGE[1997/21]
French:CIRCUIT DE DETECTION A HYSTERESIS PROPORTIONNELLE A LA TENSION DE CRETE EN ENTREE[1997/21]
Entry into regional phase07.03.1997National basic fee paid 
07.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/34]
06.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2000Fee for grant paid
27.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.03.2001
[2008/06]
Cited inInternational search[A]US5019722  (HESS ROBERT M [US], et al);
 [A]US3767938  (KUEPER T);
 [A]EP0529710  (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]);
 [A]US3617904  (MARINO FRANCIS C);
 [A]EP0366619  (MARELLI AUTRONICA [IT]);
 [A]US3944936  (PRYOR RICHARD LEE)
ExaminationJPS6020641
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850612), vol. 9, no. 136, Database accession no. (E - 320),