Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828873

EP0828873 - FLOOR TEXTILE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR, PT
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MILLIKEN DENMARK A/S
Fabriksvej
8544 Mörke / DK
[1998/12]
Inventor(s)01 / LANG, Aage
Gronnevej 2
DK-8560 Kolind / DK
02 / LANG, Jan, Torben
K.L. Knudsensvej 42
DK-8550 Ryomgaard / DK
03 / DE MEYER, Willy
Milliken Europe N.V. Ham 18-24
B-9000 Ghent / BE
[2000/22]
Former [1998/12]01 / LANG, Aage
Gr nnevej 2
DK-8560 Kolind / DK
02 / LANG, Jan, Torben
K.L. Knudsensvej 42
DK-8550 Ryomgaard / DK
03 / DE MEYER, Willy
Milliken Europe N.V. Ham 18-24
B-9000 Ghent / BE
Representative(s)Pattullo, Norman , et al
Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]Pattullo, Norman , et al
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date96914303.117.05.1996
[1998/12]
WO1996GB01189
Priority number, dateGB1995001069726.05.1995         Original published format: GB 9510697
GB1996000557316.03.1996         Original published format: GB 9605573
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9637645
Date:28.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828873
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828873
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:D02G3/04
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUSSBODENTEXTILWARE[1998/12]
English:FLOOR TEXTILE MATERIAL[1998/12]
French:TEXTILE POUR SOL[1998/12]
Entry into regional phase30.10.1997National basic fee paid 
30.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
10.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2000Fee for grant paid
22.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
[2015/21]
Former [2004/51]CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
GR01.09.2000
Former [2002/02]CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
PT31.08.2000
Former [2001/16]PT31.08.2000
Cited inInternational search[YPA]WO9530040  (KLEEN TEX IND INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-3 * page 3, line 5 - page 12, line 18; claims 1-5,16,21,22,25,26 * [A] 7,8,11;
 [YA]US5284009  (TUNG WAE-HAI [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 10; example 1; claims 1,4,7; table 3 * [A] 7,8,10;
 [A]CH614853  (SMITH PETER ASSOCIATES CARPET [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4711191  (SCHWARTZ NATHAN G [US]);
 [A]US5102713  (CORBIN JAMES A [US], et al)