Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827582

EP0827582 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSTALLING PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/11]METHOD OF INSTALLING PIPES
[1999/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BG plc
100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB
[1998/35]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / STOVES, Derek
28 Malaga Close St. Johns
Newcastle upon Tyne NE5 1YB / GB
02 / ROBINSON, William, Edgar
15 Greenway Chapel Park
Newcastle upon Tyne NE5 1SA / GB
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Kinrade, John , et al
BG plc, Intellectual Property Department 100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB
[1998/35]
Former [1998/11]Kinrade, John
BG plc, Intellectual Property Department 100 Thames Valley Park Drive
Reading, Berkshire RG6 1PT / GB
Application number, filing date96914313.020.05.1996
[1998/11]
WO1996GB01199
Priority number, dateGB1995001043322.05.1995         Original published format: GB 9510433
[1998/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9637724
Date:28.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0827582
Date:11.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827582
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/16, F16L55/28
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1998/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERLEGEN VON ROHREN[1999/28]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSTALLING PIPES[1999/28]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'INSTALLATION DE CONDUITES[1999/28]
Former [1998/11]VERFAHREN ZUM VERLEGEN VON ROHREN
Former [1998/11]METHOD OF INSTALLING PIPES
Former [1998/11]PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION DE CONDUITES
Entry into regional phase22.12.1997National basic fee paid 
22.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/11]
28.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2000Fee for grant paid
10.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AP]GB2290121  (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [AP] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2243658  (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2213230  (OSAKA BOSUI KENSETSUSHA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9007672  (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS6139400U  (...) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *