Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828468

EP0828468 - ARTICLE WITH SOFT ABSORBENT PULP SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TANZER, Richard, Warren
413 Beaulieu Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
02 / ROBINSON, Mark, Louis
1909 North Linwood Avenue
Appleton, WI 54914 / US
03 / CHEN, Fung-Jou
3216 White Birch Lane
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
04 / KAMPS, Richard, Joseph
375 Laura Court
Wrightstown, WI 54180 / US
05 / SALLEE, Lorry, Francis
N5879 30th Road
Pine River, WI 54965 / US
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2003/19]Davies, Christopher Robert , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Patent and Trade Mark Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1998/12]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date96914628.115.05.1996
[1998/12]
WO1996US06894
Priority number, dateUS1995045577831.05.1995         Original published format: US 455778
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9638111
Date:05.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828468
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828468
Date:16.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1998/12]
TitleGerman:ARTIKEL MIT WEICHER ABSORBIERENDER ZELLSTOFFSCHICHT[2001/28]
English:ARTICLE WITH SOFT ABSORBENT PULP SHEET[1998/12]
French:ARTICLE COMPRENANT UNE FEUILLE DE PATE FIBREUSE ABSORBANTE[1998/12]
Former [1998/12]ARTIKEL MIT EINE WEICHE ABSORBIERENDE ZELLSTOFFSCHICHT
Entry into regional phase03.12.1997National basic fee paid 
03.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/12]
28.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2001Fee for grant paid
16.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.2002   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette, et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
 02  16.10.2002  24.10.2002  ADMISSIBLE
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Opponent's representative
Groening, Hans Wilhelm, et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/04]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.2002   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette, et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
 02  16.10.2002  24.10.2002  ADMISSIBLE
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Opponent's representative
Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/50]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.2002   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette, et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
 02  16.10.2002  24.10.2002  ADMISSIBLE
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Opponent's representative
Metten, Karl-Heinz (DE), et al
Boehmert & Boehmert Freiherr-vom-Stein-Strasse 7
D-60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
25.11.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/41]
09.05.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.05.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.01.2002
SE16.04.2002
[2003/06]
Former [2002/37]SE16.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0483816  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [X] 1-4,10,11 * example 6; claim -; table 1 * [Y] 16-19;
 [Y]EP0615736  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [Y] 16-19 * claim - *;
 [X]US5019063  (MARSAN MARIO S ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,9,12-15 * column 7, line 33 - column 12, line 54 * * column 14, line 14 - line 51 *