EP0835131 - cDNA CLONE FOR SOUTH AFRICAN ARBOVIRUS NO. 86 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL 300 Bynum Hall, Campus Box 4100 Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27599-4100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTON, Robert, E. 101 Marin Place Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Nancy, L. 415 Sharon Road Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 03 /
SIMPSON, Dennis, A. Apartment 50, 400 Davie Road Carrboro, NC 27510 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Harrison, Michael Robert, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Belmont House 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | ||
Former [1998/16] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 96914752.9 | 22.05.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996US07457 | Priority number, date | US19950446932 | 23.05.1995 Original published format: US 446932 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637220 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835131 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835131 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C07H21/02, C12N7/04, C12N15/40, C12N15/86 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | cDNA KLON FÜR DEN SÜDAFRIKANISCHEN ARBOVIRUS NO.86 | [1998/16] | English: | cDNA CLONE FOR SOUTH AFRICAN ARBOVIRUS NO. 86 | [1998/16] | French: | CLONE D'ADNC POUR ARBOVIRUS D'AFRIQUE DU SUD No 86 | [1998/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 27.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | IT | 11.12.2002 | NL | 11.12.2002 | DK | 11.03.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | LU | 22.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2013/30] |
Former [2008/06] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
IT | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
LU | 22.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
LU | 22.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
LU | 22.05.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
DE | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
NL | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SHIRAKO Y. ET AL., "Structure of the Ockelbo virus genome and its relationship to other Sindbis viruses", VIROLOGY., ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO., US, (199106), vol. 182, no. 2, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 763 - 764, XP000856932 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(91)90616-J | [A] - RUSSELL D.L. ET AL., "Sindbis virus mutations and which coordinately affect glycoprotein processing penetration and virulence in mice", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY., US, (198904), vol. 63, no. 4, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1619 - 1629, XP000856934 [A] 1-7,10-13 | [A] - RICE C.M. ET AL., "Synthesis, cleavage and sequence analysis of DNA complementary to the 26 S messenger RNA of Sindbis virus", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19810815), vol. 150, no. 3, pages 315 - 340, XP000856933 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(81)90550-7 | [A] - RICE C.M., STRAUSS J.H., "Nucleotide sequence of the 26S mRNA of Sindbis virus and deduced sequence of the encoded virus structural proteins", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (198104), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 2062 - 2066, XP000856926 [A] 1-6 | [A] - MONROE S.S. ET AL., "Sequence analysis of cDNA's derived from the RNA of Sindbis virions and of defective interfering particles", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY., US, (198201), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 153 - 162, XP000856949 [A] 1-6 | International search | [A]US5217879 (HUANG HENRY V [US], et al) | [A] - VIROLOGY, 1988, Vol. 165, VOS et al., "Infectious RNA Transcripts Derived from Full-Length DNA Copies of the Genomic RNAs of Cowpea Mosaic Virus", pages 33-41. | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., April 1986, Vol. 83, VAN DER WERF et al., "Synthesis of Infectious Poliovirus RNA by Purified T7 RNA Polymerase", pages 2330-2334. |