blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0826128

EP0826128 - AUTOMATIC LUBRICANT-DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Perma-Tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Strasse 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
[2005/22]
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Str. 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
Former [1999/02]For all designated states
Döhring, Gerhard
Blötter Weg 154
45478 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
Raab, Holger
Möwenweg 24
27607 Langen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RAAB, Björn
Kreuzackerstrasse 25
D-27572 Bremerhaven / DE
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Rainer Harald
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Albrecht, Rainer Harald
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
Former [2004/15]Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
Former [2000/19]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/03]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [1998/42]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Former [1998/37](deleted)
Former [1998/10]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date96914917.815.04.1996
[1998/10]
WO1996EP01577
Priority number, dateDE199511423215.04.1995         Original published format: DE 19514232
DE199512646120.07.1995         Original published format: DE 19526461
DE199512891407.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19528914
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9633366
Date:24.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826128
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826128
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0826128
Date:01.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.1996
ClassificationIPC:F16N11/08
[1998/10]
CPC:
F16N11/08 (EP,KR,US); F16N2230/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/10]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN SCHMIERSTOFFABGABE[1998/10]
English:AUTOMATIC LUBRICANT-DISPENSING DEVICE[1998/10]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION AUTOMATIQUE DE LUBRIFIANT[1998/10]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1997National basic fee paid 
03.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/10]
03.09.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
17.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
24.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.03.2000Fee for grant paid
14.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  04.02.2004  WITHDRAWN
perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Strasse 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1998/10]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  04.02.2004  WITHDRAWN
perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Strasse 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al, et al
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
Former [2004/14]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  04.02.2004  WITHDRAWN
perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Strasse 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al, et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
Former [2001/17]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001   
perma-tec GmbH & Co. KG
Hammelburger Strasse 21
97717 Euerdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al, et al
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
12.03.2001No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
17.03.2001No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
27.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.07.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
15.03.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.11.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.01.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.02.2005Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.05.2002Appeal received No.  T0508/02
08.07.2002Statement of grounds filed
16.03.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/12]
21.05.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/21]
09.11.2004Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.199803   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1998
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
DK24.08.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
GR25.08.2000
[2004/51]
Former [2003/46]FI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
DK24.08.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2003/09]FI24.05.2000
NL24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2001/29]FI24.05.2000
PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2001/27]PT24.08.2000
SE24.08.2000
Former [2001/16]PT24.08.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1256001  (SATZINGER GEBHARD) [A] 5* the whole document *;
 [A]WO8908800  (WYSSMANN MAX [CH]) [A] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *;
 [AD]DE9214096U  (HORNCHE TRADING) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4330793  (KOREA LUBE TECH LTD [KR]) [A] 1,10,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - "SICHER UND SPARSAM", BETRIEBSTECHNIK, (19911201), vol. 32, no. 12, page 22, XP000239948 [A] 1,9,14 * the whole document *
OppositionTW80214553
 DE8900076U
 DE9309575U
 US5271528
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.