Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0821710

EP0821710 - POLYKETONE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Former [1998/06]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ASH, Carlton, Edwin
119 Wilkins Crossing
Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US
02 / WATERS, Dixie, Green
9130 Elizabeth
Houston, TX 77055 / US
[1998/06]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96914955.818.04.1996
[1998/06]
WO1996EP01647
Priority number, dateUS1995042484519.04.1995         Original published format: US 424845
[1998/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9633237
Date:24.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0821710
Date:04.02.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.1996
[1998/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0821710
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/3492, C08L73/00
[1998/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/06]
TitleGerman:POLYKETONPOLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1998/06]
English:POLYKETONE POLYMER COMPOSITION[1998/06]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMERE A BASE DE POLYCETONE[2002/16]
Former [1998/06]COMPOSITION POLYMERE AU POLYCETONE
Entry into regional phase02.10.1997National basic fee paid 
02.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/06]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2002Fee for grant paid
13.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL25.09.2002
AT18.04.2003
GB18.04.2003
ES19.04.2003
SE19.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/43]NL25.09.2002
AT18.04.2003
GB18.04.2003
SE19.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/29]NL25.09.2002
GB18.04.2003
SE19.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/28]NL25.09.2002
GB18.04.2003
SE19.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/22]NL25.09.2002
GB18.04.2003
SE19.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/16]NL25.09.2002
SE19.04.2003
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0654469  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [PX] 1-4,6,7 * page 6, line 5 - line 15; example 12 * * page 10, line 9 *;
 [E]GB2297091  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [E] 1,4,5 * page 13, paragraph 3 * * page 10, line 13 - line 14 * * claims 1,7,8 *;
 [A]EP0444323  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 3, line 20 - line 54; example 1; claims 1,5,9,10 *