Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0824348

EP0824348 - TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS WITH 11-CIS-RETINOIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRAIMAN, Mark S.
1618 Shady Grove Court
Charlottesville, VA 22902-7218 / US
[1998/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96915529.006.05.1996
[1998/09]
WO1996US06359
Priority number, dateUS1995043580405.05.1995         Original published format: US 435804
MX1995000388511.09.1995         Original published format: MX 9503885
[1998/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9634601
Date:07.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0824348
Date:25.02.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1996
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0824348
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.11.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/203, A61P17/06
[2001/27]
Former International [2001/23]A61K31/203
Former International [1998/09]A61K31/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/09]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG DER PSORIASIS MIT 11-CIS-RETINSÄURE[2001/23]
English:TREATMENT OF PSORIASIS WITH 11-CIS-RETINOIC ACID[1998/09]
French:TRAITEMENT DU PSORIASIS A L'ACIDE 11-CIS-RETINOIQUE[1998/09]
Former [1998/09]BEHANDLUNG DER PSORIASIS MIT 11-CIS-RETINOESÄURE
Entry into regional phase03.12.1997National basic fee paid 
03.12.1997Search fee paid 
03.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/09]
20.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2002Fee for grant paid
01.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Request for further processing for:05.04.2002Request for further processing filed
17.05.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
FI11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
IT11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
FI11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2006/14]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
FI11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2005/21]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
FI11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2005/02]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
MC31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
LU06.05.2003
Former [2004/04]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT11.09.2002
BE11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT11.09.2002
CH11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
LI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE11.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4877805  (KLIGMAN ALBERT M [US]) [DA] 1-14 * column 8 - column 9; examples 1-4 * * column 1, lines 21-24 *;
 [DA]WO9315740  (KLIGMAN ALBERT M [US]) [DA] 1-14 * page 25 - page 28; examples 1-9 * * page 31; claim 11 * * page 12; table 1 *;
 [A]  - LEWIN, ANITA H. ET AL, "The requirement for a retinoic acid lactone of 11 - cis,13- cis -stereochemistry for topical dermatologic activity", PHARM. RES. (1994), 11(7), 1065-7, XP002119103 [A] 1-14 * page 1066, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018955925223
International search[Y]US5093360  (YU RUEY J [US], et al)