blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0846293 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0846293



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 726
16.12.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
10.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
13.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.01.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 31
04.01.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 31
04.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.01.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.08.2015 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
27.02.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 37
27.02.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
11.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
29.01.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.10.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.11.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
02.09.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.04.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.04.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
07.02.2011 Claims Appeal 3
07.02.2011 Claims Appeal 4
07.02.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
03.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
03.02.2011 Claims Appeal 3
03.02.2011 Claims Appeal 4
03.02.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
30.11.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.11.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
04.11.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 5
04.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.10.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
30.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.07.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
06.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
06.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 16
30.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
30.06.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 16
25.06.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 3
18.06.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.06.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
17.06.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.06.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
11.06.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.06.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.06.2010 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
07.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
07.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
07.06.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
07.06.2010 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
07.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 14
07.06.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 14
19.04.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.04.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.03.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
08.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.03.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.03.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
29.04.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.04.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
30.08.2007 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.08.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
29.06.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.03.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.09.2006 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
20.06.2006 Request for change of name Search / examination 4
20.04.2006 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
25.11.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.11.2005 Request for change of name Search / examination 4
29.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.08.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.03.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.03.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
16.12.2004 Description Search / examination 3
16.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.04.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.03.2004 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.04.1999 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.03.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.02.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.02.1999 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
29.04.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.03.1998 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
17.03.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.12.1997 Claims Search / examination 7
15.12.1997 Description Search / examination 16
15.12.1997 Drawings Search / examination 11
15.12.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.12.1997 Request for change of name Search / examination 1
15.12.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.07.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 33
29.07.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
27.06.1997 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 12
29.01.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.11.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.11.1996 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 48
21.11.1996 Priority document Search / examination 50