blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0832306


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
18.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2001 [2001/27]
03.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
06.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
23.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.06.1999 Renewal fee
31.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
31.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
27.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant
08.01.1999 Examination report or reply
08.01.1999 Change - divisional application(s) published on  24.02.1999 [1999/08]
29.10.1998 Examination report or reply
24.06.1998 Renewal fee
19.06.1998 First examination report
18.06.1998 Examination report or reply
13.02.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.04.1998 [1998/14]
13.02.1998 Request for examination filed published on  01.04.1998 [1998/14]
23.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
19.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
27.07.1996 PCT data prior to European publication