blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0832306

Designated contracting states DE 
 DKLapse: 07.06.2000
 ESLapse: 08.06.2000
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 SELapse: 08.06.2000
Examination procedure28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase12.12.1997National basic fee paid 
12.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted05.01.2000
Opposition procedure06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.12.2000 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:01.04.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:01.04.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19971212
 
Event date:05.08.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980625
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:10.01.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.
 
Event date:10.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69606036
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000210
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:07.04.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:08.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:01.06.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2144240 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:07.06.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20000607
 
Event date:08.06.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20000608
 
Event date:08.06.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20000608
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:05.02.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:19.02.2001 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
Ref Document Number:96915925.0
Format of Ref Document F/P:F
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:05.06.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20020605
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:07.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030607
 
Event date:28.01.2004 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20030607
 
Event date:16.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20010712
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20080626
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20080612
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080617
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:26.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100226
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100101
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090607
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20150609
Year of Fee Payment:20