Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0832306

EP0832306 - CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF NICKEL AND COBALT FROM SULPHIDE ORES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMINCO ENGINEERING SERVICES LTD.
200 Burrard Street, Suite 500 Vancouver
British Columbia V6C 3L7 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
COMINCO ENGINEERING SERVICES LTD.
200 Burrard Street, Suite 500
Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 3L7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, David, L.
1028 - 51A Street
Delta, British Columbia V4M 2X8 / CA
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date96915925.007.06.1996
[1998/14]
WO1996CA00365
Priority number, dateUS1995048812807.06.1995         Original published format: US 488128
[1998/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9641029
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0832306
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0832306
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:C22B23/00, C22B11/00, C22B15/00, C22B3/26, C22B3/38, C22B3/06, C25C1/08
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/14]
TitleGerman:CHLORIDUNTERSTÜTZTE HYDROMETALLURGISCHE EXTRAKTION VON NICKEL UND KOBALT AUS SULPHIDERZEN[1998/14]
English:CHLORIDE ASSISTED HYDROMETALLURGICAL EXTRACTION OF NICKEL AND COBALT FROM SULPHIDE ORES[1998/14]
French:EXTRACTION HYDROMETALLURGIQUE, ASSISTEE PAR DES CHLORURES DE NICKEL ET DE COBALT A PARTIR DE MINERAIS SULPHURES[1998/14]
Entry into regional phase12.12.1997National basic fee paid 
12.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/14]
25.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1999Fee for grant paid
28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98204322.6  / EP0930373
EP98204323.4  / EP0924307
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK07.06.2000
ES08.06.2000
SE08.06.2000
[2004/28]
Former [2003/46]DK07.06.2000
SE08.06.2000
Former [2001/27]SE08.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0209272  (CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY) [X] 48,51,54,55 * column 3, line 35 - line 51; claims 1,5,6 *;
 [Y]US2520958  (POOLE H.G.) [Y] 48-55 * column 1 - column 3 *;
 [YA]FR1559880  (SHERITT GORDON MINES LTD) [Y] 48-55 * page 3 - page 6 * [A] 1,30-34;
 [A]US4108639  (LAKE M.J. ET AL.) [A] 1,4-6,42-47 * figures 1-4; claims 1,16-27 *;
 [A]US4971662  (SAWYER H.D. ET AL.) [A] 1,35-41 * column 2; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US4039406  (STANLEY R.W. ET AL.) [A] 1,35-41 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 64; figure 1; claims 1,5-7 *;
 [A]US4457897  (STANLEY R.W. ET AL.) [A] 1,5 * column 5 - column 6; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4861371  (LOWENHAUPT H.) [A] 1,4-6 * column 1, line 26 - line 58; claims 1,6,7; table 3 *;
 [A]GB2018732  (INCO LIMITED) [A] 1,6,42 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 8 *;
 [A]GB970011  (INTERNATIONAL NICKEL COMPANY OF CANADA) [A] 1,4,68-75 * page 1; figure 1; claims 1-17 *;
 [Y]US4600435  (WIEGERS B. ET AL.) [Y] 68-75 * see the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0651062  (QUEENSLAND NICKEL PTY LTD) [Y] 68-75 * page 5 - page 7; claims 1-25 *;
 [Y]US3981968  (MILLER D.J. ET AL.) [Y] 68-75 * column 9, line 41 - column 13, line 41; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4818503  (NYMAN B.G. ET AL.) [A] 68 * column 6; claims 1-3 *