Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0879138

EP0879138 - METHOD OF MAKING GRADED INDEX POLYMERIC OPTICAL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[1998/48]
Inventor(s)01 / JUIJN, Johannes, Anthonij
Zilvermeeuwstraat 10
NL-6883 KE Velp / NL
02 / KRINS, Bastiaan
Lionderstuk 25
NL-6932 LP Westervoort / NL
03 / OVERDIEP, Wigle, Sjoerd
Hulzevoortseweg 5
NL-6996 DG Drempt / NL
04 / VAN ANDEL, Eleonoor
Strootmanveg 12
NL-7548 RB Enschede / NL
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis , et al
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis , et al
AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Former [1998/48]Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis , et al
Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Application number, filing date96916112.413.05.1996
[1998/48]
WO1996EP02123
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9636478
Date:21.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0879138
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996
[1998/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879138
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search reportEP21.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:B29D11/00, G02B6/16, G02B1/04
[1998/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN OPTISCHEN FASERN MIT GRADUIERTEM BRECHUNGSINDEX[1998/48]
English:METHOD OF MAKING GRADED INDEX POLYMERIC OPTICAL FIBRES[1998/48]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES POLYMERES A GRADIENT D'INDICE[1998/48]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1997National basic fee paid 
22.10.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/48]
10.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
IT05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
LU13.05.2000
IE15.05.2000
DK05.07.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2007/29]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
LU13.05.2000
IE15.05.2000
DK05.07.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2004/07]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
DK05.07.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2003/46]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
DK05.07.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2003/18]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2003/17]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
MC05.06.2000
PT05.07.2000
Former [2002/27]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
ES05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2002/02]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
CH05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2001/50]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
IE15.05.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2001/24]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
PT05.07.2000
MC30.11.2000
Former [2001/16]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
PT05.07.2000
Former [2001/11]AT05.04.2000
BE05.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0615141  (KOIKE YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-8 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 40 * * page 4, line 52 - line 54 * * page 5, line 25; table 2 *;
 [X]JPH01265207  ;
 [DA]EP0496893  (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * claims 1,5 * * page 8, line 28 - line 54 * * page 9; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]GB1439627  (NIPPON SELFOC CO LTD) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]FR2682969  (VERRE FLUORE SA [FR]) [A] 1 * claims 1-17 * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 *
 [X]  - 1, Database accession no. 89-353291, XP002013893 [X] 1 * abstract *