blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0830201 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0830201



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 580
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
12.04.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.04.2006 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.04.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
24.03.2006 French translation of claims Opposition 2
24.03.2006 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
24.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.03.2006 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.12.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
27.12.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
27.12.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
19.12.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
19.12.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
17.06.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
17.05.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.04.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.04.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
29.03.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.03.2005 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
08.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 3
16.11.2004 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
13.03.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
05.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
03.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2002 General authorisation Appeal 1
27.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.11.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.10.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
13.09.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.09.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.09.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.08.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
19.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
19.06.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
19.06.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
19.06.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
19.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.06.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.06.2002 Text intended for grant Opposition 10
03.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
03.06.2002 Claims Opposition 1
03.06.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.06.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
31.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.05.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.04.2002 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
24.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Claims Opposition 2
12.04.2002 Claims Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Claims Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Claims Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Claims Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
10.04.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
02.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
04.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.2002 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.01.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.12.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.12.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.06.2001 Claims Opposition 1
09.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
09.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
09.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.06.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
04.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.06.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.06.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.06.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
11.04.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
20.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
20.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
20.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
19.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.10.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
21.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
21.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.10.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 4
23.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
14.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Description Search / examination 3
14.05.1999 Description Search / examination 2
14.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
14.05.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
28.04.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.01.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
14.01.1999 Description Search / examination 2
14.01.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.01.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
04.12.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.12.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
09.11.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.11.1997 Annex Search / examination 6
12.11.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.1997 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.10.1997 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 1
07.10.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
19.02.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.12.1996 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
12.12.1996 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
12.12.1996 Priority document Search / examination 22