Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0830201


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.04.2006 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  24.05.2006  [2006/21]
30.03.2006 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
22.12.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.12.2005 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
15.06.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.06.2005 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
29.03.2005 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.03.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2005 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  20.04.2005  [2005/16]
02.03.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
02.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
02.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply
10.01.2005 Appeal number
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
06.12.2002 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  22.01.2003  [2003/04]
30.11.2002 Unpublished change to opponent data
15.11.2002 Change - appeal
09.09.2002 Change - appeal
02.09.2002 Change - appeal
30.08.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
14.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
14.06.2002 Change - oral proceedings
11.01.2002 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  27.02.2002  [2002/09]
17.12.2001 Change - oral proceedings
22.06.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
23.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
17.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
27.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  13.12.2000 [2000/50]
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
26.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
19.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.05.1999 Renewal fee
21.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant
04.12.1998 First examination report
01.12.1998 Communication of intention to grant
04.06.1998 Renewal fee
06.02.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.03.1998 [1998/13]
06.02.1998 Request for examination filed published on  25.03.1998 [1998/13]
02.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
20.11.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
27.07.1996 PCT data prior to European publication