blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0830201

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 05.06.2000
 MCLapse: 30.06.2000
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase12.11.1997National basic fee paid 
12.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted19.01.2000
Opposition procedure22.03.2006Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition28.08.2002APPEAL FILED
29.10.2002APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
10.06.2005APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.03.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:25.03.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19971112
 
Event date:20.01.1999 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19981204
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:188883
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000215
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:21.01.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.
 
Event date:31.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:31.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:04.02.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:24.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69606292
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000224
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:08.03.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:16.03.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2141504 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20000225
 
Event date:05.06.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20000605
 
Event date:26.06.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:30.06.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20000630
 
Event date:13.12.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:DMC2 DEGUSSA METALS CATALYSTS CERDEC AG
Effective DATE:20001019
 
Event date:01.02.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:DMC2 DEGUSSA METALS CATALYSTS CERDEC AG
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:27.02.2002 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:OMG AG & CO.KG
Effective DATE:20001019
 
Event date:01.05.2002 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:OMG AG & CO.KG
 
Event date:22.01.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:OMG AG & CO.KG
Effective DATE:20001019
 
Event date:01.04.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:OMG AG & CO.KG
 
Event date:20.04.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:UMICORE AG & CO. KG
Effective DATE:20001019
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:UMICORE AG & CO. KG
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20060524
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T4
Code Expl.: AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:13.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE RPEO
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN AMENDED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20060401625 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE
 
Event date:01.08.2006 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20060524
 
Event date:02.10.2006 
Event description:NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE
 
Event date:01.11.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 20060614 T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
 
Event date:17.11.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION
 
Event date:15.10.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
Free Format Text:JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY#78 HATTON GARDEN#LONDON EC1N 8JP (GB) -TRANSFER TO- JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY#78 HATTON GARDEN#LONDON EC1N 8JP (GB)
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20080516
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20080513
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20080605
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:29.08.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20080515
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20080606
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20080519
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.09.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20080515
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20080522
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20080516
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20080519
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20080528
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:29.05.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20080514
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:16.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT MM4A
Code Expl.:-ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT
Free Format Text:LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES
Effective DATE:20091207
 
Event date:31.12.2009 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*JOHNSON MATTHEY P.L.C.
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090605
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:08.02.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:01.03.2010 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20100101
 
Event date:26.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100226
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091207
 
Event date:31.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090605
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080513
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090605
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100101
 
Event date:26.08.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20090606
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090606
 
Event date:29.10.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100107
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090605
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090606
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20150619
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20150618
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:05.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69606292 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20160604
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20160604