Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0830201

EP0830201 - DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
78 Hatton Garden
London EC1N 8JP / GB
[1998/13]
Inventor(s)01 / ANSELL, Graham Paul
1 Thornbury Green
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9RH / GB
02 / FISHER, Janet Mary
14 Tithebarn Grove
Calcot, Reading RG31 7YX / GB
03 / GRAY, Peter Geoffrey
The Linney, Blounts Court Road
Sonning Common, Reading RG4 9RS / GB
04 / HAMILTON, Hugh Gavin Charles
12 Rotherfield Way
Caversham, Reading RG4 8PL / GB
05 / RAJARAM, Raj Rao
78 Norfolk Avenue
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3AD / GB
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Wishart, Ian Carmichael , et al
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading, RG4 9NH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Wishart, Ian Carmichael , et al
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blounts Court Sonning Common
Reading, Berks RG4 9NH / GB
Application number, filing date96916227.005.06.1996
[1998/13]
WO1996GB01322
Priority number, dateGB1995001141206.06.1995         Original published format: GB 9511412
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9639244
Date:12.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0830201
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996
[1998/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0830201
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0830201
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94
[1998/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/13]
TitleGerman:DIESELMOTORABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM[1998/13]
English:DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM[1998/13]
French:SYSTEME DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR DIESEL[1998/13]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1997National basic fee paid 
12.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/13]
04.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/16]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Umicore AG & Co. KG
Rodenbacher Chaussee 4
63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2003/04]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
OMG AG & CO.KG
P.O. BOX 1351
63403 HANAU / DE
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2002/09]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000  17.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
OMG AG & CO.KG
P.O. BOX 1351
63403 HANAU / DE
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2000   
dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG
Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
22.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.06.2002Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.06.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.06.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.12.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.03.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.08.2002Appeal received No.  T0904/02
29.10.2002Statement of grounds filed
10.06.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU05.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2002/42]MC30.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[E]EP0716877  (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC) [E] 1-7 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 48 * * page 5, line 21 - line 25; claims 1-10; table 1 *;
 [X]US5078979  (DUNNE STEPHEN R) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 14 *;
 [X]EP0584737  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 16; table 3 *;
 [X]US4934142  (HAYASHI KOTARO ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 9; claims 1,6-9 *;
 [Y]US5407880  (IKEDA TAKUYA ET AL) [Y] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 54 *;
 [Y]EP0559021  (DEGUSSA) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 3, line 3 - line 40; claims 1-10 *