Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0834317

EP0834317 - AMELIORANT FOR PRURITUS CUTANEOUS ACCOMPANYING RENAL FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute of Immunology Co., Ltd.
1-10, Koraku 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112 / JP
[1998/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HOSOKAWA, Tomoyoshi
10-18, Kikuna 6-chome Koohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222 / JP
02 / ANDO, Kunio
1877, Shimosakunobe Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213 / JP
03 / SHIMAOKA, Tatsuro
9-13, Gion 5-chome Minamikawachi-machi
Kawachi-gun Tochigi 329-04 / JP
04 / NAKAMURA, Tetsuo
Paakuhaimu Ogikubo 701 28-14, Ogikubo 4-chome
Suginami-ku Tokyo 167 / JP
[1998/15]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/15]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date96916359.111.06.1996
[1998/15]
WO1996JP01576
Priority number, dateJP1995018050114.06.1995         Original published format: JP 18050195
[1998/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9700075
Date:03.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834317
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1997
[1998/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.01.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, C07H3/06
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/15]
TitleGerman:HEILMITTEL FÜR DAS MIT NIERENVERSAGEN EINHERGEHENDE HAUTJUCKEN[1998/15]
English:AMELIORANT FOR PRURITUS CUTANEOUS ACCOMPANYING RENAL FAILURE[1998/15]
French:MEDICAMENT CONTRE LE PRURIT CUTANE ACCOMPAGNANT L'INSUFFISANCE RENALE[1998/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.1998Translation filed 
07.01.1998National basic fee paid 
07.01.1998Search fee paid 
07.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/45]
05.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6345222  ;
 [A]WO8800830  (FISONS PLC [GB]) [A] * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 10 *
 [X]  - MIURA M ET AL, "SHORT TERM EFFECT OF LACTULOSE THERAPY IN PATIENTS WITH CHRONIC RENAL FAILURE", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1990), Database accession no. PREV199090079615, XP002207940 [X] 1-5 * abstract *
    [] - TOKAI JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL MEDICINE, (1990), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0385-0005, pages 29 - 34,
 [X]  - BIAM, URL: http://www2.biam2.org/www/Spe6244.html, (20020722), XP002207939 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WATANABE MASAYOSHI ET AL, "Mechanism for Lowering Blood Ammonia Levels by Lactitol.", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1995), Database accession no. PREV199598317985, XP002207941 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1995), vol. 67, no. 4, ISSN 0021-5198, pages 369 - 374,
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880722), vol. 012, no. 263, Database accession no. (C - 514), [X] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH04190764  (AARU ENU EE KENKIYUUSHIYO YUUG)
 [X]  - MEDICINE AND PHARMACY, Vol. 27, No. 1, (1992), YOSHIKAZU MATSUDA et al., "Effects of Lactulose on a Model of Rabbit Acute Renal Failure", p. 49-54.,