Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0834157

EP0834157 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEXTURE MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Shi-Long
663 Wagner Street
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
[1998/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96916588.523.05.1996
[1998/15]
WO1996US07573
Priority number, dateUS1995047587207.06.1995         Original published format: US 475872
[1998/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9641314
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0834157
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0834157
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/10
[1998/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR TEXTURABBILDUNG[1998/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TEXTURE MAPPING[1998/15]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL EN VUE D'UNE DEFINITION DE TEXTURE[1998/15]
Entry into regional phase24.11.1997National basic fee paid 
24.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/15]
28.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0637813  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al);
 [PA]EP0656609  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al)
 [A]  - HECKBERT P S, "Survey of texture mapping", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, NOV. 1986, USA, ISSN 0272-1716, vol. 6, no. 11, pages 56 - 67, XP000002233 [A] 1-24 * page 59, column R, paragraph 5 *
 [A]  - GANGNET M ET AL, "Perspective mapping of planar textures", COMPUTERS & GRAPHICS, 1984, UK, ISSN 0097-8493, vol. 8, no. 2, pages 115 - 123, XP000579660 [A] 1-24 * page 121, column R, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0097-8493(84)90045-1
 [A]  - GEORGE WOLBERG, Digital Image Warping, LOS ALAMITOS, CA 90720-1264, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY PRESS, XP002012021 [A] 1-24 * page 192, paragraph 2; figure 7.4 * * page 196, paragraph 3 *