Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0830546

EP0830546 - LIGHTER WITH LOOPED GUARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.11.2006  [2006/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIC CORPORATION
(a Connecticut Corporation) 500 Bic Drive
Milford CT 06460 / US
[2006/32]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
BIC CORPORATION
500 Bic Drive Milford
Connecticut 06460 / US
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
BIC CORPORATION
500 Bic Drive
Milford Connecticut 06460 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCDONOUGH, James, M.
46 Crabapple Lane
Guilford, CT 06437 / US
02 / DOIRON, Gerald, J.
867 Chestnut Court
Marco Island, FL 33937 / US
03 / ADAMS, Paul, H.
21 Perry Drive
Monroe, CT 06468 / US
04 / FAIRBANKS, Floyd, B.
103 Birch Lane
Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US
05 / HAMILTON, Arthur, R., Jr.
Unit 323, 196 New Haven Avenue
Derby, CT 06418 / US
06 / LAFOREST, Guy
Travesa Temente Valaoim, N. 3
P-Cascais / PT
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Shanks, Andrew
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date96916945.703.06.1996
[1998/13]
WO1996US08319
Priority number, dateUS1995048685507.06.1995         Original published format: US 486855
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9641103
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0830546
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0830546
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F23Q1/02, F23Q2/16, F23Q2/46
[2000/46]
Former International [1998/13]F23Q1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/13]
TitleGerman:FEUERZEUG MIT RINGARTIGE SICHERUNG[1998/13]
English:LIGHTER WITH LOOPED GUARD[1998/13]
French:BRIQUET MUNI D'UNE PROTECTION EN FORME DE BOUCLE[1998/13]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1997National basic fee paid 
04.12.1997Search fee paid 
04.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/13]
24.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2005Fee for grant paid
29.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9504247  (BIC CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,13-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3439994  (CASSAN MICHEL) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-3 *
International search[A]US5096414  (ZELLWEGER CONRAD [CH]);
 [A]US4822276  (BISBEE JERRY L [US]);
 [A]US5066220  (VICK HENRY L [US])