Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0832496

EP0832496 - SWITCHING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
ABB RESEARCH LTD.
P.O. Box 8131
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / HENRION, Claude
16, rue du 11-Novembre
F-69800 Saint-Priest / FR
02 / JOHANSSON, Gunnar
Ritblocksvägen 10
S-724 71 Väster s / SE
03 / STEPHANSSON, Paul
Arholmavägen 37
S-182 45 Enebyberg / SE
04 / VEFLING, Harald
General Fleischersv. 21
N-1343 Eriksmarka / NO
 [2001/21]
Former [1998/14]01 / HENRION, Claude
16, rue du 11-Novembre
F-69800 Saint-Priest / FR
02 / JOHANSSON, Gunnar
Ritblocksvägen 10
S-724 71 Väster s / SE
03 / STEPHANSSON, Paul
Brageveien 3B
N-0452 Oslo / NO
04 / VEFLING, Harald
General Fleischersv. 21
N-1343 Eriksmarka / NO
Representative(s)Lundblad Pinnekamp, Katarina , et al
Asea Brown Boveri AB
Patent
721 78 Västeras / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Lundblad Vannesjö, Katarina , et al
Asea Brown Boveri AB, Patent
721 78 Västeras / SE
Application number, filing date96917798.912.06.1996
[1998/14]
WO1996SE00762
Priority number, dateSE1995000212312.06.1995         Original published format: SE 9502123
[1998/14]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9642098
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/56]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0832496
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996
[1998/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0832496
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01H47/00
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/20]
Former [1998/14]BE,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:SCHALTEINRICHTUNG[1998/14]
English:SWITCHING EQUIPMENT[1998/14]
French:EQUIPEMENT DE COMMUTATION[1998/14]
Entry into regional phase23.10.1997Translation filed 
11.12.1997National basic fee paid 
11.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/14]
07.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2001Fee for grant paid
09.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.05.2001
IT23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
ES03.09.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2004/03]BE23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
ES03.09.2001
Former [2003/09]BE23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/12]BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0252808
 [A]EP0558190
 [A]EP0400389