blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0957975

EP0957975 - MULTI-PHASIC MICROPHOTODIODE RETINAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/47]MULTI-PHASIC MICROPHOTODIODE RETINAL IMPLANT AND ADAPTIVE IMAGING RETINAL STIMULATION SYSTEM
[2003/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optobionics Corporation
850 East Diehl Road, Suite 120
Naperville, IL 60563 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
Optobionics Corporation
850 East Diehl Road, Suite 120
Napperville, IL 60563 / US
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
CHOW, Vincent
7980 Kingsbury Drive
Hanover Park, IL 60103 / US
For all designated states
Chow, Alan Y.
191 Palomino Place
Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
CHOW, Vincent
7980 Kingsbury Drive
Hanover Park, IL 60103 / US
For all designated states
Chow, Alan Y.
191 Palamino Place
Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chow, Vincent
7980 Kingbury Drve
Hanover Park, IL 60103 / US
02 / Chow, Alan Y.
191 Palamino Place
Wheaton, IL 60187 / US
 [2004/26]
Former [1999/47]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1999/47]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date96918042.104.06.1996
[1999/47]
WO1996US08734
Priority number, dateUS1995046576606.06.1995         Original published format: US 465766
US1996064270203.06.1996         Original published format: US 642702
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9639221
Date:12.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957975
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957975
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0957975
Date:01.12.2004
[2004/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61F9/08
[2000/10]
CPC:
A61N1/0543 (EP,US); A61N1/05 (EP,KR,US); A61F9/08 (EP,US);
A61N1/36046 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/47]A61N1/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/47]
TitleGerman:RETINAL-IMPLANTAT AUS MEHRPHASIGEN MIKROFOTODIODEN[2003/47]
English:MULTI-PHASIC MICROPHOTODIODE RETINAL IMPLANT[2003/47]
French:IMPLANT RETINIEN A BASE DE MICROPHOTODIODES A PLUSIEURS PHASES[2003/47]
Former [1999/47]RETINAL-IMPLANTAT AUS MEHRPHASIGEN MIKROFOTODIODEN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR REIZUNG DER RETINA MITTELS ADAPTIERENDER BILDERZEUGUNG
Former [1999/47]MULTI-PHASIC MICROPHOTODIODE RETINAL IMPLANT AND ADAPTIVE IMAGING RETINAL STIMULATION SYSTEM
Former [1999/47]IMPLANT RETINIEN A BASE DE MICROPHOTODIODES A PLUSIEURS PHASES ET SYSTEME DE SIMULATION RETINIENNE PAR IMAGERIE ADAPTATIVE
Entry into regional phase30.12.1997National basic fee paid 
30.12.1997Search fee paid 
30.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.12.1997Examination requested  [1999/47]
22.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2004Fee for grant paid
23.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04008614.2  / EP1435255
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.04.2004
[2005/02]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0460320  (CHOW ALAN Y [US]) [A] 1,12-17,20-23,29,34,35,51,52* column 5, lines 34-52; claims 1,20-12 *
International search[A]GB2016276  (ROSS FOUNDATION FOR RESEARCH I);
 [A]US4628933  (MICHELSON ROBIN P [US]);
 [A]US5109844  (DE JUAN JR EUGENE [US], et al);
 [X]US5397350  (CHOW ALAN Y [US], et al)
by applicantUS5024223
 US5397350
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.