Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0844895

EP0844895 - LOW PROFILE BALLOON CATHETER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2000
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2000 [2000/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intella Interventional Systems, Inc.
870 Hermosa Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[1998/23]
Inventor(s)01 / IMRAN, Mir, A.
26641 Laurel Lane
Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US
02 / GANDHI, Deepak, R.
911 Bowen Avenue
San Jose, CA 95123 / US
03 / HEGDE, Anant, V.
36105 Toulouse Street
Newark, CA 94560 / US
[1998/23]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date96918322.705.06.1996
[1998/23]
WO1996US09481
Priority number, dateUS1995050765526.07.1995         Original published format: US 507655
[1998/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9704829
Date:13.02.1997
Language:EN
[1997/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0844895
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1997
[1998/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M29/00, A61M25/10, A61M29/02
[2000/01]
Former International [1998/23]A61M29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/23]
TitleGerman:NIEDRIGPROLFILBALLONKATHETER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE METHODE[1998/24]
English:LOW PROFILE BALLOON CATHETER AND METHOD[1998/23]
French:CATHETER A BALLONNET DE PROFIL PEU ELEVE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT[1998/23]
Former [1998/23]BALLONKATHETER MIT KLEINEM QURESCHNITT SOWIE VERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase09.02.1998National basic fee paid 
09.02.1998Search fee paid 
09.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
01.01.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/34]
29.03.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2000/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5304132  (JANG G DAVID [US]);
 [X]US4958634  (JANG G DAVID [US]);
 [A]US5328472  (STEINKE THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [A]US5242396  (EVARD PHILIP C [US])