Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0830500

EP0830500 - IMPROVED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2003  [2003/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAWLOR, Shawn P.
7113 139th Place N.E.
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[1998/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. , et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date96918366.407.06.1996
[1998/13]
WO1996US09612
Priority number, dateUS1995048066307.06.1995         Original published format: US 480663
[1998/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9641073
Date:19.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0830500
Date:25.03.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996
[1998/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02C3/14, F02C5/02, F02C6/00, F02K7/00, F02C3/16
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/13]F02C3/14, F02C5/02, F02C6/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/13]
Extension statesLT07.01.1998
LV07.01.1998
SI07.01.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG VON ENERGIE[2002/42]
English:IMPROVED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER GENERATION[1998/13]
French:AMELIORATIONS D'UN PROCEDE ET D'UN APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE PUISSANCE[1998/13]
Former [1998/13]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWINNUNG VON ENERGIE
Entry into regional phase07.01.1998National basic fee paid 
07.01.1998Search fee paid 
07.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/13]
18.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/42]
15.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0370209  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5372005  (LAWLOR SHAWN P [US]) [A] 1,10,18,37 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4577460  (WIRSCHING WAYNE S [US]) [X] 1,10,18,37 * figure - *;
 [X]US4208590  (BLOMQUIST CECIL R [US], et al) [X] 1,10,18,37 * figure - *;
 [X]US3118277  (A. F.WORMSER) [X] 1,10,18,37 * column 2, line 35 - line 58; figure - *;
 [A]US2709895  (MOUNT WADSWORTH W) [A] 1,10,18,37 * abstract *
International search[X]US3118277  ;
 [Y]US2709895  (MOUNT WADSWORTH W);
 [A]US5129227  (KLEES GARRY W [US], et al)