Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0772569

EP0772569 - CATALYTIC DESULPHURIZATION PROCESS FOR A GAS CONTAINING H2S AND SO2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/20]CATALYTIC DESULPHURIZATION PROCESS FOR A GAS CONTAINING H 2?S AND SO 2? COMPOUNDS, AND CATALYST FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID PROCESS
[1999/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION
Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]For all designated states
ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION
Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / NOUGAYREDE, Jean
13, rue du Professeur-J.-Monod
F-64000 Pau / FR
02 / PHILIPPE, André
Lotissement de la Trinité
F-64300 Orthez / FR
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Boillot, Marc
Elf Exploration Production Département Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf EP/T/RD/DPI - Bureau 34 G 47
92078 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]Boillot, Marc
Elf Aquitaine Production, Département Propriété Industrielle, Tour Elf, Cédex 45
92078 Paris La Défense / FR
Application number, filing date96918725.128.05.1996
[1997/20]
WO1996FR00799
Priority number, dateFR1995000633130.05.1995         Original published format: FR 9506331
[1997/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9638378
Date:05.12.1996
Language:FR
[1996/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0772569
Date:14.05.1997
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0772569
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:C01B17/04, B01J32/00
[1997/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/20]
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFELUNG EINES H2S UND SO2 ENTHALTENDEN GASES[1999/29]
English:CATALYTIC DESULPHURIZATION PROCESS FOR A GAS CONTAINING H2S AND SO2[1999/29]
French:PROCEDE DE DESULFURATION CATALYTIQUE D'UN GAZ RENFERMANT LES COMPOSES H2S ET SO2[1999/29]
Former [1997/20]KATALYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFELUNG EINES H2S UND SO2 ENTHALTENDEN GASES UND KATALYSATOR ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES SOLCHEN VERFAHRENS
Former [1997/20]CATALYTIC DESULPHURIZATION PROCESS FOR A GAS CONTAINING H 2?S AND SO 2? COMPOUNDS, AND CATALYST FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID PROCESS
Former [1997/20]PROCEDE DE DESULFURATION CATALYTIQUE D'UN GAZ RENFERMANT LES COMPOSES H 2?S ET SO 2? ET CATALYSEUR POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DUDIT PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase14.02.1997National basic fee paid 
14.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/20]
30.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
LU28.05.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2003/17]AT12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
MC31.05.2000
Former [2002/23]AT12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2001/22]AT12.01.2000
IE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
Former [2001/17]AT12.01.2000
IE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0422999  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 17-19,21-23 * page 4, line 7 - line 9; claims 1-12 * [Y] 20;
 [YA]WO9112201  (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]) [Y] 20 * the whole document * [A] 1-16;
 [YA]EP0218302  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [Y] 20 * column W * [A] 1-16;
 [X]DD129037  (HAASE RUDOLF, et al) [X] 17-19,21,22,24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4054642  (DAUMAS JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) [A] 1-16 * column W *