EP0835489 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USING INVERTED DATA TO DETECT CORRUPT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/16] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USING MIRRORED DATA TO DETECT CORRUPT DATA | ||
[1999/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARY, Scott, P. 1744 Crane Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
POPE, David, E. 46 Woods Lane Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Tao 19627 Brockton Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96919156.8 | 05.06.1996 | [1998/16] | WO1996US09257 | Priority number, date | US19950484704 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484704 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641261 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835489 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835489 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/08, G06F11/16, G06F11/20 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G06F11/167 (EP,US);
G06F11/08 (EP,US);
G11C29/74 (EP,US);
G06F2201/865 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | G06F11/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM GEBRAUCH INVERTIERTER DATEN ZUR ERKENNUNG VERFÄLSCHTER DATEN | [1998/16] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USING INVERTED DATA TO DETECT CORRUPT DATA | [1999/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'UTILISER DES DONNEES SOUS FORME DE COPIE INVERSE POUR DETECTER DES DONNEES ALTEREES | [1999/52] |
Former [1998/16] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USING MIRRORED DATA TO DETECT CORRUPT DATA | ||
Former [1998/16] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'UTILISER DES DONNEES SOUS FORME DE COPIE MIROIR POUR DETECTER DES DONNEES ALTEREES | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 25.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6152758 ; | [XY]DE3312873 (DEUTSCHE FERNSPRECHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 15 * claims 1,3 * [Y] 1-14,16-20; | [Y]EP0323123 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,9 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 3 *; | [Y]EP0615211 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,10,11,17 * column 6, line 18 - line 27 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 5 *; | [YA] - B. STROUSTRUP, The C++ Programming Language, NEW-YORK, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1991), XP002013777 [Y] 1,2,5-9,12-14,16,18-20 * Second edition; page 229, line 10 - page 233, line 41 * [A] 5,6,12,13,18,19 | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Dual Storage System", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198406), vol. 27, no. 1A, page 360, XP002013776 [A] 1,2,9,15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860726), vol. 010, no. 215, Database accession no. (P - 481), & JP61052758 A 19860315 (HIOKI DENKI KK) [A] 3,4,10,11,17 * abstract * |