Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0773629

EP0773629 - Method for detecting and correcting transmission errors of a digital signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/20]METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CORRECTING TRANSMISSION ERROR OF DIGITAL SIGNAL
[1999/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imazu, Ryuzo
19-10-407, Shinashiyakami, Suita-shi
Osaka 565 / JP
[1997/20]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96920011.230.05.1996
[1997/20]
WO1996JP01468
Priority number, dateJP1995013238630.05.1995         Original published format: JP 13238695
[1997/20]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9638922
Date:05.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773629
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1996
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773629
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.12.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/00
[1998/37]
Former International [1997/20]H03M13/00, H04L1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Detektion und Korrektur von Übertragungsfehlern eines digitalen Signales[1999/23]
English:Method for detecting and correcting transmission errors of a digital signal[1999/23]
French:Procédé de detection et de correction d'une erreur de transmission dans des signaux numériques[1999/23]
Former [1997/20]DIGITALSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSFEHLERERKENNUNG UND KORREKTURVERFAHREN
Former [1997/20]METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CORRECTING TRANSMISSION ERROR OF DIGITAL SIGNAL
Former [1997/20]PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET DE CORRECTION D'UNE ERREUR DE TRANSMISSION DANS LES SIGNAUX NUMERIQUES
Entry into regional phase23.01.1997Translation filed 
23.01.1997National basic fee paid 
23.01.1997Search fee paid 
23.01.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
01.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2000Fee for grant paid
13.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.04.2000
[2008/06]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS5526715  (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD);
 [A]JPS63226141  (FUJITSU LTD)