Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0820545

EP0820545 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING LOW CONCENTRATION, HIGH-VOLUME NON-CONDENSABLE GASES PRODUCED IN A KRAFT PULPING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kvaerner Pulping AB
Box 1033
651 15 Karlstad / SE
[N/P]
Former [1998/05]For all designated states
KVAERNER PULPING AB
Box 1033
651 15 Karlstad / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BARSIN, Joseph, A.
5500 Five Knoll Drive
Charlotte, NC 28226 / US
02 / OSCARSSON, Bo
12027 East Field Road
Huntersville, NC 28078 / US
03 / SMITH, David
3375 West 8th Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V5R 3Y3 / CA
[1998/05]
Application number, filing date96920079.911.04.1996
[1998/05]
WO1996SE00471
Priority number, dateUS1995042231013.04.1995         Original published format: US 422310
[1998/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9632532
Date:17.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0820545
Date:28.01.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1996
[1998/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0820545
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:D21C11/12, D21C11/06
[1998/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   PT,   SE [1998/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG GROSSER MENGEN VON IN NIEDERIGER KONZENTRATION IN EINEM KRAFT-AUFSCHLUSSVERFAHREN AUFTRETENDEN FLÜCHTIGEN GASEN[1998/05]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING LOW CONCENTRATION, HIGH-VOLUME NON-CONDENSABLE GASES PRODUCED IN A KRAFT PULPING PROCESS[1998/05]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ELIMINER LES GAZ NON CONDENSABLES, A GRAND VOLUME ET FAIBLEMENT CONCENTRES, PRODUITS LORS D'UN PROCESSUS DE REDUCTION EN PATE DE PAPIER KRAFT[1998/05]
Entry into regional phase26.09.1997National basic fee paid 
26.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
26.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
22.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2002Fee for grant paid
17.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
[2003/31]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3396076  (CROSBY HARTZELL L, et al);
 [A]US3520772  (LINDBERG ERIK AXEL SIGVARD)
 [A]  - SVENSK PAPPERSTIDNING, 1969, SIGVARD LINDBERG, "How Uddeholm Destroys Air and Water Pollutants at the Skoghall Works", pages 484-487.,
 [A]  - TAPPI, Volume 48, No. 5, May 1965, DONALD F. ADAMS, "A Survey of European Kraft Mill Odor Reduction Systems", pages 83A-87A.,