Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0824702

EP0824702 - GIMBALLED VIBRATING WHEEL GYROSCOPE HAVING STRAIN RELIEF FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE CHARLES STARK DRAPER LABORATORY, INC.
555 Technology Square
Cambridge, MA 02139-3563 / US
[1998/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GREIFF, Paul
2 Cameron Road
Wayland, MA 01778 / US
02 / ANTKOWIAK, Bernard, M.
178 Federal Hill Road
Oxford, MA 01540 / US
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Feldmann, Clarence Paul
Schneider Feldmann AG
Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
8002 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]Feldmann, Clarence Paul
Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG, Kanalstrasse 17
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date96920146.608.05.1996
[1998/09]
WO1996US06426
Priority number, dateUS1995044053612.05.1995         Original published format: US 440536
[1998/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9635957
Date:14.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0824702
Date:25.02.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1996
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0824702
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.11.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01P9/04, G01P15/125, G01C19/56, G01P15/08
[1999/40]
Former International [1998/09]G01P9/04, G01P15/125
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/09]
TitleGerman:KARDANAUFGEHÄNGTES GYROSKOP MIT VIBRIERENDEM RING, DAS MERKMALE ZUM ABBAU VON SPANNUNGEN AUFWEIST[1998/09]
English:GIMBALLED VIBRATING WHEEL GYROSCOPE HAVING STRAIN RELIEF FEATURES[1998/09]
French:GYROSCOPE A ROUE VIBRATOIRE MONTE SUR CARDAN ET POSSEDANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES DE DETENTE[1998/09]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1997National basic fee paid 
03.11.1997Search fee paid 
03.11.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/09]
26.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2002Fee for grant paid
28.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
17.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US3113463  ;
 [X]US5251484  ;
 [X]US5377544