Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0771491

EP0771491 - VERY LOW NOISE, WIDE FREQUENCY RANGE PHASE LOCK LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VLSI TECHNOLOGY, INC.
MS/45, 1109 McKay Drive
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[1998/02]
Former [1997/19]For all designated states
VLSI TECHNOLOGY, INC.
MS/45, 1109 McKay Drive
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
For all designated states
Bhushan, Bharat
10660 Hale Place
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
For all designated states
Arcus, Christopher A.
15272 Charmeran
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
For all designated states
Ta, Paul D.
1141 Chavez Way
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BHUSHAN, Bharat
10660 Hale Place
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / ARCUS, Christopher, A.
15272 Charmeran
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
03 / TA, Paul, D.
1141 Chavez Way
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[1997/19]
Representative(s)Kahler, Kurt
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/19]Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Application number, filing date96920258.916.05.1996
[1997/19]
WO1996US07098
Priority number, dateUS1995044285017.05.1995         Original published format: US 442850
[1997/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9637044
Date:21.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0771491
Date:07.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.1996
[1997/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0771491
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03K3/0231, H03L7/099
[1997/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [1997/19]
TitleGerman:PHAZENREGELKREIS MIT EINEM GROSSEN FREQUENZBEREICH UND SEHR NIEDRIGEM RAUSCHEN[1997/19]
English:VERY LOW NOISE, WIDE FREQUENCY RANGE PHASE LOCK LOOP[1997/19]
French:BOUCLE A PHASE ASSERVIE SILENCIEUSE ET COMPORTANT UNE LARGE GAMMEDE FREQUENCES[1997/19]
Entry into regional phase14.02.1997National basic fee paid 
14.02.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
15.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2001Fee for grant paid
26.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9401927  (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 13 - page 6, line L; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5412349  (YOUNG IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 27; figures 1,2A,2C,2D *