blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0835093

EP0835093 - HAIR DYE AGENTS WITH AT LEAST ONE CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.04.2010
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/50]For all designated states
HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2003/12]For all designated states
Hans Schwarzkopf & Henkel GmbH & Co. KG
Hohenzollernring 127
22763 Hamburg / DE
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
Hans Schwarzkopf GmbH & Co. KG
Hohenzollernring 127
22763 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DEUTZ, Herbert
c/o Aengenheister Keldenicher Strasse 44
D-53925 Kall / DE
02 / AKRAM, Mustafa
Zylberbergstrasse 14
D-22457 Hamburg / DE
03 / KLEEN, Astrid
Kraepelinweg 30
D-22081 Hamburg / DE
[1998/16]
Representative(s)Strohe-Kamp, Geertje, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]Strohe-Kamp, Geertje, et al
Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/16]Foitzik, Joachim Kurt (DE), et al
Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96920808.107.06.1996
[1998/16]
WO1996EP02482
Priority number, dateDE1995102256926.06.1995         Original published format: DE 19522569
DE1996101749002.05.1996         Original published format: DE 19617490
[1998/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9701323
Date:16.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0835093
Date:15.04.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0835093
Date:10.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.1997
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/13
[1998/16]
CPC:
A61K8/55 (EP,US); A61K8/42 (EP,US); A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US); A61Q5/10 (EP,US); A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/16]
TitleGerman:HAARFÄRBEMITTEL MIT MINDESTENS EINEM PFLEGESTOFF[1998/16]
English:HAIR DYE AGENTS WITH AT LEAST ONE CONDITIONER[1998/16]
French:AGENTS DE COLORATION CAPILLAIRES COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN PRINCIPE ACTIF TRAITANT[1998/16]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1997National basic fee paid 
17.12.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/16]
25.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
19.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2003Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.12.2004  21.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E.
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2005/05]
Opponent(s)01  10.12.2004   
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Fevrier, Murielle
L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
14.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.07.2007Date of oral proceedings
21.08.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.08.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/20]
13.01.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.10.2007Appeal received No.  T1859/07
21.12.2007Statement of grounds filed
13.01.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
13.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
PT10.08.2004
[2011/25]
Former [2008/06]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
PT10.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI10.03.2004
IE10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI10.03.2004
SE10.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0026473  (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11,14,16-18,28,29-32;
 [A]US4268264  (GROLLIER JEAN F, et al) [A] 1-32;
 [A]DE3929333  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-32;
 [A]DE4136997  (GOLDWELL AG [DE])[A] 1-32;
 [X]WO9319725  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-19,26-28,30-32
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.