blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0775496

EP0775496 - HYDROUS COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CHOLESTEROL ESTER CLATHRATE, A COSMETIC CONTAINING THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/22]CHOLESTEROL ESTER CLATHRATE, WATER-HOLDING COMPOSITION, HYDROUS COMPOSITIONS, COSMETICS CONTAINING THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF
[2006/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 25.06.2008  [2008/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[2007/12]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
7-5-5, Ginza
Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-10 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAMANO, Yohei
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
02 / NASU, Akio
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
03 / MINAMI, Takashi
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
04 / MIYAZAKI, Takayuki
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
05 / TOMITA, Noriko
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
06 / MATSUMOTO, Takashi
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
07 / SOYAMA, Yoshikazu
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
08 / ITO, Kenzo
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
09 / MATSUDA, Hajime
Shiseido Research Center(1) 1050, Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 223 / JP
10 / SUMIYOSHI, Hideyuki
1291-11, Hina Fuji-shi
Shizuoka 417 / JP
[1997/22]
Representative(s)Jones, Helen M.M., et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1997/22]Perry, Robert Edward, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date96921132.501.07.1996
[1997/22]
WO1996JP01815
Priority number, dateJP1995018615429.06.1995         Original published format: JP 18615495
JP1995033787030.11.1995         Original published format: JP 33787095
[1997/22]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9701356
Date:16.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775496
Date:28.05.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0775496
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.01.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K8/63, A61K8/73, A61K47/40, A61K47/48
[2006/21]
CPC:
A61Q19/00 (EP,US); A61K47/40 (KR); A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US); A61K8/738 (EP,US); B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/56 (EP,US); A61Q1/06 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2001/26]A61K47/40, A61K7/48
Former IPC [1997/22]A61K47/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/22]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EINEN CHOLESTERINESTER-CLATHRAT, DIESE ENTHALTENDES KOSMETIKUM UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG[2006/21]
English:HYDROUS COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CHOLESTEROL ESTER CLATHRATE, A COSMETIC CONTAINING THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF[2006/21]
French:COMPOSITION HYDRATEE COMPRENANT UN CLATHRATE D'ESTER DE CHOLESTEROL, PRODUIT COSMETIQUE LA CONTENANT, ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION[2006/21]
Former [1997/22]CHOLESTERINESTERCLATHRAT, WASSERSPEICHERNDES PRÄPARAT, WASSERHALTIGE PRÄPARATE, KOSMETIKA, DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG
Former [1997/22]CHOLESTEROL ESTER CLATHRATE, WATER-HOLDING COMPOSITION, HYDROUS COMPOSITIONS, COSMETICS CONTAINING THE SAME, AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF
Former [1997/22]CLATHRATE D'ESTER DE CHOLESTEROL, COMPOSITION RETENANT L'EAU, COMPOSITIONS HYDRATEES, PRODUITS COSMETIQUES LES CONTENANT, ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION
Entry into regional phase17.03.1997Translation filed 
21.03.1997National basic fee paid 
21.03.1997Search fee paid 
21.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/35]
18.06.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2007Fee for grant paid
29.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL21.03.2007
GB01.07.2007
ES02.07.2007
[2008/26]
Former [2008/06]NL21.03.2007
ES02.07.2007
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS5858139  (NIHON SAAFUAKUTANTO KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPS63194726  (KAO CORP)
ExaminationEP0366154
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.