EP0837168 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CUSHIONING STRUCTURE USING FIBER ASSEMBLY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Masanao, Teijin Limited Osaka Research enter, 4-1, Minohara 3-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
OHKOUCHI, Hideki, Teijin Limited Osaka Research Center, 4-1, Minohara 3-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96921142.4 | 02.07.1996 | [1998/17] | WO1996JP01828 | Priority number, date | JP19950168698 | 04.07.1995 Original published format: JP 16869895 | JP19960072637 | 27.03.1996 Original published format: JP 7263796 | [1998/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9702377 | Date: | 23.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0837168 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0837168 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/02, D04H1/54, B68G7/06, D04H1/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B29C43/34 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/542 (KR);
B29C33/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29C43/006 (EP,KR,US);
B29C43/36 (EP,KR,US);
B68G7/06 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/02 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4391 (KR);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/541 (KR);
D04H1/558 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/76 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/17] | D04H1/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLSTERSTRUKTUR AUS EINER FASERANORDNUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2007/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING CUSHIONING STRUCTURE USING FIBER ASSEMBLY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [1998/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE MATELASSAGE AU MOYEN D'UN ENSEMBLE DE FIBRES | [1998/17] |
Former [1998/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLSTERSTRUKTUR VON EINER FASERANORDNUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1997 | Translation filed | 29.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.06.2007 | GB | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | FR | 01.02.2008 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/32] | IT | 06.06.2007 | |
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
FR | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | IT | 06.06.2007 | |
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/06] | SE | 06.09.2007 | |
ES | 17.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5378296 (VESA JUHA [FI]) [X] 1,11,18,19,23,26 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH06192952 ; | [A]WO9415768 (NOWO DEV OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0596476 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-2C * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941019), vol. 018, no. 547, Database accession no. (C - 1262), & JP06192952 A 19940712 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH07324266 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPH0610255 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA); | [A]JPH0348837 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |