EP0830336 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TERTIARY AMINOCARBONATES AND AMINOETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION 199 Benson Road Middlebury, Connecticut 06749 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Crompton Corporation 199 Benson Road Middlebury, Connecticut 06749 / US | ||
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Route 100C, Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTRON, Victor 1 Leonard Lane Charleston, WV 25314 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921265.3 | 07.06.1996 | [1998/13] | WO1996US08682 | Priority number, date | US19950477322 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 477322 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640613 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830336 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830336 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/06, C07C69/96 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
C07C213/06 (EP,US);
C07C68/06 (KR);
C07C217/42 (KR);
C07C69/96 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TERTIÄREN AMINOCARBONATEN UND AMINOETHERN | [1998/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TERTIARY AMINOCARBONATES AND AMINOETHERS | [1998/13] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'AMINOCARBONATES ET D'AMINOETHERS TERTIAIRES | [1998/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4203908 (RWE DEA AG [DE]) [A] 1,18 * pages 4-5; examples 1,2 *; | [A]EP0476785 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [A] 1,18 * page 21; example 28 * | International search | [A]US5175333 (KERSCHNER JUDITH L [US], et al) |