EP0832100 - NOVEL INHIBITORS OF METALLOPROTEASES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/14] | NOVEL INHIBITORS OF METALLOPROTEASES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME AND METHODS OF THEIR USE | ||
[1999/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPBELL, David, A. 1492 Ascension Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Dinesh, V. 45109 Cougar Circle Fremont, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
XIAO, Xiao, Y. 11025 N. Torrey Pines Road 100 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96921482.4 | 06.06.1996 | [1998/14] | WO1996US09932 | Priority number, date | US19950484255 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484255 | US19950549345 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 549345 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9640738 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832100 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832100 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/60, C07C311/46, C07D213/75, C07D209/48, C07D295/12, C07K5/06, A61K31/16, A61K38/05 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
C07C323/60 (EP,US);
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06095 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/14] | C07K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/14] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE METALLOPROTEASE-INHIBITOREN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1999/13] | English: | NOVEL INHIBITORS OF METALLOPROTEASES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME | [1999/13] | French: | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEASES ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [1999/13] |
Former [1998/14] | NEUARTIGE METALLOPROTEASE-INHIBITOREN, DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1998/14] | NOVEL INHIBITORS OF METALLOPROTEASES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME AND METHODS OF THEIR USE | ||
Former [1998/14] | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEASES, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 22.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2000 | BE | 05.04.2000 | CH | 05.04.2000 | ES | 05.04.2000 | FI | 05.04.2000 | GR | 05.04.2000 | LI | 05.04.2000 | NL | 05.04.2000 | IE | 06.06.2000 | LU | 06.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | DK | 05.07.2000 | PT | 05.07.2000 | SE | 05.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
ES | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
GR | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
ES | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
ES | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
ES | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
ES | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 06.06.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
FI | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/26] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5387610 (GRAY ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]WO9512603 (SYNTEX INC [US]) | [A] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., Volume 96, Number 4, 31 October 1980, LIORENS et al., "Rational Design of Enkephalinase Inhibitors: Substrate Specificity of Enkephalinase Studies from Inhibitory Potency of Various Dipeptides", pages 1710-1716. |