blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0834124


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.07.2002 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
28.07.2001 (Expected) grant published on  12.09.2001 [2001/37]
05.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
22.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.12.2000 Communication of intention to grant
29.12.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.11.2000 First examination report
07.11.2000 Communication of intention to grant
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Supplementary search report published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Change - classification published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
23.06.1999 Renewal fee
06.11.1998 Change - applicant published on  23.12.1998 [1998/52]
24.06.1998 Renewal fee
20.02.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.04.1998 [1998/15]
20.02.1998 Request for examination filed published on  08.04.1998 [1998/15]
10.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
07.03.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.1996 PCT data prior to European publication