blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0834124
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3165158BGlobal Dossier 14.05.2001B2
JPH10511790 10.11.1998A
Priority number Date
US9610516 17.06.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0834124Global Dossier 12.09.2001B1
EP0834124 19.04.2000A4
EP0834124 08.04.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9610516 17.06.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT205614T 15.09.2001T
Priority number Date
US9610516 17.06.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69615187D 18.10.2001D1
Priority number Date
US9610516 17.06.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69615187T 04.07.2002T2
Priority number Date
US9610516 17.06.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5940588 17.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US68504196 23.07.1996
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9700478Global Dossier 03.01.1997A1
Priority number Date
US49115795 16.06.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5539878 23.07.1996A
Priority number Date
US49115795 16.06.1995